+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
On April 11, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB608ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985362809
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor