+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB607ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985342202
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor