+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/16)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB605ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted in part
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 (96-Y 0-N)
- Speaker ruled Governor's recommendation #2 paragraph part 3 out of order
- House rejected Governor's recommendation #2 severed - paragraph part 2 (32-Y 65-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 65-N)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB605ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105450D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB605H1
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105450D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100091D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 11, 2016: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2016: VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 65-N)
March 10, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor