+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 8-N)
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended HB6046E
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: --- Constitutional Rdg Dispe (90-Y 0-N)
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- Amendments by Delegate Toscano agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 081229600-E
- Passed House (90-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (90-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N)
On June 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 081229600
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (90-Y 0-N)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- Constitutional Rdg Dispe (90-Y 0-N)
July 9, 2008: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (6-Y 8-N)
June 25, 2008: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
L. Scott Lingamfelter
Type:
Primary Sponsor