+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB604ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 8-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 986297296-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (15-Y 10-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 986297296
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Transportation w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 8-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/amds. (15-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor