+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 274 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB603ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101480D
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2010: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor