+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 4, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0918)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 918 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB603ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: McQuigg, Sherwood, Amundson
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Chichester, Bolling, Edwards
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (3-Y 95-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (20-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 005348844