+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100489D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2020: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N)
January 28, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Nicholas J. Freitas
Type:
Primary Sponsor