+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB602ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Ed.
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 982202388-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 982202388
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor