+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (11-Y 1-N)
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- Constitutional reading dispensed (90-Y 0-N)
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 083613528-H1
- VOTE: --- Constitutional Rdg Dispe (90-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB6019H1
- Passed House (51-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (51-Y 44-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On July 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On June 24, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083613528-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 5-N)
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 06/23/08 083583528
+ − Votes (4)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (51-Y 44-N)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- Constitutional Rdg Dispe (90-Y 0-N)
July 9, 2008: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (11-Y 1-N)
June 24, 2008: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Phillip A. Hamilton
Type:
Primary Sponsor