+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB601ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Senator Marsden agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (9-Y 4-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- Rereferred from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 26-N)
- Read third time and passed House (71-Y 26-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #4
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101929D