+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (7-Y 7-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 4-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 026078636
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2002: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (7-Y 7-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
February 4, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor