+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB597ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- Rereferred from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14104306D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB597EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Loupassi agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104306D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104306D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100362D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Rereferred from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
January 29, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor