+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Incorporates HB717
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12104598D-H1
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100590D