+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 455 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB596ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989099146-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989099146-H1
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989099146-H1
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983189146
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor