+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 805 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB594ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Dance agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB594H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106512D-H1
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106512D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101405D