+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (41-Y 55-N)
- Engrossment refused by House (41-Y 55-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (13-Y 10-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 000181844