+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB590ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989658450-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989658450-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989658450-H2
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981556450-H1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981484450
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor