+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100850D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor