+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB585ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 980827100