+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100079D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Elizabeth R. Guzman
Type:
Primary Sponsor