+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N)
- Read third time and passed House (56-Y 42-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB584H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 040977348-H1
- Read second time
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 040977348-H1
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 043527348
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2004: Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (56-Y 42-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor