+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB580ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 986641362-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 986641362-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 986641362-S1
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 986632362-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 986632362-H1
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 986632362-H1
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 989123362
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor