+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB580ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB580ER)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB580ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 081854472-H1
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB580EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Cosgrove agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 081854472-EH1
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 081854472-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087434844
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 2008: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 13, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor