+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective - see bill)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB580ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB580H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104705D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104705D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103552D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor