+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB58ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101217D
+ − Votes (9)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor