+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB576ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1 (Orrock)
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067340432
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor