+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Failed to pass
- No further action taken
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Cosgrove, McDougle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Habeeb, Bell, Robert B., Mullin
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107677D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB571S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107677D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107677D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB571E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 18101985D-E
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101985D
+ − Votes (9)
March 6, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 16, 2018: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor