+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB570ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 834 (effective 1/1/99)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB570ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (11-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 988771202-H1
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee substitute agreed to 988771202-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988771202-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 980837825
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (11-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor