+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB569ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102254D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions