+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB568ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (7-Y 3-N 2-A)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee substitute printed LD3459428 (HB568H1)
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed