+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB566ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105729D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB566H1
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20105729D-H1
- Incorporates HB786 (Bagby)
- Incorporates HB1130 (Lopez)
- Incorporates HB391 (Scott)
- Incorporates HB814 (Ward)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Social Services
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105131D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2020: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
February 24, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (9-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Elizabeth R. Guzman
Type:
Primary Sponsor