+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1995 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD6641428 (HB565E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 1994: Continued to 1995 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
February 18, 1994: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor