+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (13-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 026096656-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 026096656
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2002: Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 27, 2002: Pursuant to S. Rule 20(j), rerefer. by C.J. (13-Y 2-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
February 8, 2002: Reported from C. J. with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor