+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0971)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 971 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB561ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB561H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107098D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107098D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103235D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Emily M. Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor