+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100719D
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2010: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
January 19, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor