+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 606 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB555ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Holland, Stosch, Marye
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: DeBoer, Hull, Rust
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 98-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 98-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987305805
- Referred to Committee on Finance