+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB554ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985375805-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985375805
- Referred to Committee on Finance