+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0897)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 897 (effective 1/1/99)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (38-Y 60-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (38-Y 60-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB553ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989659845-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989659845-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989659845-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 4
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 980767845
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (38-Y 60-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1998: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor