+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB552ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #1
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101016D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor