+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB552ER)
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 6-N)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Delegates: Rust, Reese, Brink
On March 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senators: Howell, Wagner, Mims
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 90-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (7-Y 90-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 024137922-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 024137922
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 7, 2002: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 90-N)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2002: Reported from Local Government w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor