+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 1/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB551ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (93-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (67-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103525D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (93-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor