+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed Bill reprinted 989151200-E
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989151200-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (19-Y 3-N)
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (25-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989151200
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (19-Y 3-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor