+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0858)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 858 (effective 7/1/02)
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB55ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB55ER)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/13/01 024005226