+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance by voice vote
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989150200-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 989150200
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989150200
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor