+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 230 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB547ER)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 966466817-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 966466817
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor