+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective - see bill)
On March 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB543ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 8-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB543H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 045191400-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 045191400-H1
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from S.T. w/sub (12-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 045169400
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from S.T. w/sub (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor