+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0215)
- Enacted, Chapter 215 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB541ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB541ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB541H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104932D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104932D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103546D