+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB540ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor