+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 490 (effective 4/4/12)
On March 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB54ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB54H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104642D-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104642D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/12 12100855D
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2012: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor